|
07/18/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 154, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
07/18/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/18/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 6109.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4627.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5089.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|