Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2024
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5546.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on E.M. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|