California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB278 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2023

Amended

Bill September 1, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023