|
09/27/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 742, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 5.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2024
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 1. Page 5318.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
(Pending re-refer to Com. on INS.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
Re-referred to Coms. on C. & C. and INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|