California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2795 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2024

Amended

Bill August 28, 2024
Bill August 15, 2024
Bill March 21, 2024