Senate | 07/01/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/12/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2024 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2024 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4999.) | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2024 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17). | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2024 | Read first time. To print. |