Senate
|
06/17/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5356.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|