Assembly
|
09/14/2023
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Holden.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 2706.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 1997.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/25/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|