California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2807 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2024

Amended

Bill June 3, 2024
Bill April 3, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024