LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2809
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2809
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2023-2024 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2809
Action History
Assembly
04/09/2024
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
Assembly
04/08/2024
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
Assembly
03/18/2024
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and P. & C.P.
Assembly
02/16/2024
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
Assembly
02/15/2024
Read first time. To print.