California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2821 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2024

Amended

Bill June 12, 2024
Bill May 16, 2024
Bill April 1, 2024