Assembly | 05/16/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5215.) | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2024 | Read first time. To print. |