|
09/25/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 577, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|