Senate | 08/30/2024 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Caballero. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2024 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2024 | From Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2024 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2024 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4999.) | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2024 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17). | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2024 | Read first time. To print. |