Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 1. Page 5512.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (April 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|