California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2866 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2024

Amended

Bill August 23, 2024
Bill July 3, 2024
Bill June 24, 2024