California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2875 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2024

Amended

Bill August 21, 2024
Bill August 19, 2024