Assembly | 05/16/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2024 | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2024 | Read first time. To print. |