California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2883 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2024

Amended

Bill May 16, 2024
Bill March 19, 2024