|
09/20/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 315, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 11. Page 5185.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|