Senate
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2024
|
(Pending re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2024
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4775.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|