Senate | 07/02/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Held without recommendation. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 5417.) | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2024 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2024 | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2024 | Read first time. To print. |