California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2925 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2024

Amended

Bill August 23, 2024
Bill August 15, 2024
Bill June 20, 2024
Bill May 16, 2024
Bill April 18, 2024
Bill April 11, 2024
Bill March 19, 2024