California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2926 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2024

Amended

Bill August 22, 2024
Bill June 24, 2024