|
09/28/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 845, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5518.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2024
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|