|
09/28/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 846, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2024
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|