California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2951 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2024

Amended

Bill August 21, 2024
Bill July 3, 2024
Bill June 27, 2024
Bill June 10, 2024