06/14/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 18, Statutes of 2024. | |||
06/14/2024 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
06/11/2024 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4290.). | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (May 28). | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | Referred to Com. on PUB S. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4780.) | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2024 | From Consent Calendar by request of Assembly Member Essayli. To Third Reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 2). | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2024 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2024 | Read first time. To print. |