Senate
|
08/31/2024
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Gonzalez.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 5442.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5215.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|