|
08/26/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 205, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 6239.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2024
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|