|
09/25/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 583, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2024
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 5163.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2024
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|