Senate | 08/15/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/05/2024 | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 07/02/2024 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2024 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5523.) | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16). | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2024 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2024 | Read first time. To print. |