Senate | 08/31/2024 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Gonzalez. | ||
Senate | 08/19/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2024 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 15). | ||
Senate | 07/01/2024 | In committee: Referred to suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | Referred to Com. on PUB S. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 17. Page 5297.) | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5146.) | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2024 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 17). | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2024 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2024 | Read first time. To print. |