California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3023 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2024

Amended

Bill August 15, 2024
Bill June 20, 2024
Bill May 20, 2024
Bill April 16, 2024
Bill April 2, 2024
Bill March 21, 2024