California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3031 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2024

Amended

Bill August 15, 2024
Bill June 26, 2024
Bill April 11, 2024