Assembly | 05/02/2024 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2024 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2024 | Read first time. To print. |