LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB3039
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB3039
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2023-2024 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB3039
Action History
Assembly
05/29/2024
From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Assembly
04/16/2024
In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
Assembly
03/27/2024
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Assembly
03/11/2024
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S.
Assembly
02/17/2024
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
Assembly
02/16/2024
Read first time. To print.