Assembly
|
09/27/2024
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2024
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5090.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2024
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2024
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|