|
09/22/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 429, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2024
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (August 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4661.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|