California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3072 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2024

Amended

Bill June 5, 2024
Bill May 20, 2024
Bill May 7, 2024
Bill March 19, 2024
Bill March 11, 2024