California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3074 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2024

Amended

Bill April 16, 2024
Bill April 9, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024