Assembly
|
02/01/2024
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2024
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|