Assembly | 05/16/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 19. Noes 1.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2024 | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2024 | Read first time. To print. |