California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3119 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2024

Amended

Bill August 6, 2024
Bill June 10, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024