Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 15. Page 5189.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2024
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|