Assembly | 05/16/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5215.) | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2024 | Read first time. To print. |