Senate | 08/15/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2024 | In committee: Referred to suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 5349.) | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 8). | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2024 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2024 | Read first time. To print. |