California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3148 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2024

Amended

Bill August 5, 2024
Bill June 10, 2024