|
09/22/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 435, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2024
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5530.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2024
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|