Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
(Pending re-refer to Com. on JUD.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|